Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471866

EP3471866 - MICROFLUIDIC MIXER AND METHOD OF MIXING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carbus - Veículos E Equipamentos Lda
Rua dos Pinheiros s/n
Parque de Negócios UIC
Cernache de Bonjardim
6100-266 Sertã / PT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CASCALHEIRA, António
Rua dos Pinheiros s/n
Parque de Negociós UIC
Cernache do Bonjardim
6100-266 Sertã / PT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17731893.821.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP65278
Priority number, datePT2016010947821.06.2016         Original published format: PT 2016109478
GB2016001078421.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610784
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220674
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471866
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01F13/00, B01F11/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:MIKROFLUIDISCHER MISCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2019/17]
English:MICROFLUIDIC MIXER AND METHOD OF MIXING LIQUIDS[2019/17]
French:MÉLANGEUR MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉLANGE DE LIQUIDES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
21.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2006024206  (SINHA NAVEEN N [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,9,16 [I] 5-8,10-15;
 [XI]WO03015923  (BIOMICRO SYSTEMS INC [US]; ADEY NILS [US]; LEI MING [US]; SPUTE MARK [) [X] 5,7,8,10-13,15 * page 1, line 14 - line 18 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 9 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 14 * * figure - * [I] 1-4,6,9,14,16;
 [XI]WO0054874  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 2,3,5,7,8,10-13,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - paragraph 8 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figure - * [I] 1,4,6,9,14,16