Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471671

EP3471671 - GUIDE APPARATUS FOR TANGENTIAL ENTRY INTO SUPRACHOROIDAL SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orbit Biomedical Limited
215 Euston Road
London NW1 2BE / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / OBERKIRCHER, Brendan J.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US
02 / KO, Benjamin L.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / ROTH, Robert H.
4362 Creek Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
04 / ORTIZ, Mark S.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / MEYER, Thomas E.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
06 / BUSCH, Franklin S.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
07 / KHAN, Isaac J.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
08 / KEANE, Michael F.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, Ohio 19044 / US
09 / RAYMOND, Anna R.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
10 / SCHUBERT, Jacob W.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]01 / OBERKIRCHER, Brendan J.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US
02 / KO, Benjamin L.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / ROTH, Robert H.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / ORTIZ, Mark S.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / MEYER, Thomas E.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
06 / BUSCH, Franklin S.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
07 / KHAN, Isaac J.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
08 / KEANE, Michael F.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, Ohio 19044 / US
09 / RAYMOND, Anna R.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
10 / SCHUBERT, Jacob W.
205 West 4th Street, Suite 1140
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Representative(s)Bettridge, Paul Sebastian
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17732004.114.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37364
Priority number, dateUS201662351620P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351620 P
US20171560941931.05.2017         Original published format: US201715609419
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017218613
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3471671
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN TANGENTIALEN EINTRITT IN DEN SUPRACHOROIDALEN RAUM[2019/17]
English:GUIDE APPARATUS FOR TANGENTIAL ENTRY INTO SUPRACHOROIDAL SPACE[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL DE GUIDAGE POUR ENTRÉE TANGENTIELLE DANS UN ESPACE SUPRACHOROÏDAL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1806102  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6,7;
 [YA]US2002169465  (BOWMAN STEVEN M [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-11 * [A] 1
by applicantUS2015223977
 US2015351958
 US2015351959
 US2016074212
 US2016074217
 US2016074211
 US2016081849
 US7413734