Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463397

EP3463397 - SELECTIVELY ALTERING MICROBIOTA FOR IMMUNE MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snipr Technologies Limited
Kemp House
152 City Road
London EC1V 2NX / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CLUBE, Jasper
Kemp House
152 City Road
London EC1V 2NX / GB
02 / SOMMER, Morten
c/o SNIPR Biome ApS
Lersø Parkallé 42, 5.floor
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
03 / GRØNDAHL, Christian
c/o Jasper Clube
Kemp House
152 City Road
London EC1V 2NX / GB
04 / VAZQUEZ-URIBE, Ruben
c/o SNIPR Biome ApS
Lersø Parkallé 42, 5.floor
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
05 / VAN DER HELM, Eric
c/o SNIPR Biome ApS
Lersø Parkallé 42, 5.floor
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 [2019/16]
Former [2019/15]01 / CLUBE, Jasper
Kemp House
152 City Road
London EC1V 2NX / GB
02 / SOMMER, Morten
Novo Nordisk Foundation Center for
Biosustainability Technical University of Denmark
(DTU)
Kogle Allé 6
2970 Hørsholm Copenhagen / DK
03 / GRØNDAHL, Christian
c/o Jasper Clube
Kemp House
152 City Road
London EC1V 2NX / GB
04 / VAZQUEZ-URIBE, Ruben
Novo Nordisk Foundation Center for
Biosustainability Technical University of Denmark
(DTU)
Kogle Allé 6
2970 Hørsholm Copenhagen / DK
05 / VAN DER HELM, Eric
Novo Nordisk Foundation Center for
Biosustainability Technical University of Denmark
(DTU)
Kogle Allé 6
2970 Hørsholm Copenhagen / DK
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17732041.304.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63593
Priority number, dateGB2016000981105.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201609811
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211753
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463397
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/17, A61K35/15, A61P37/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/7105
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE ÄNDERUNG DER DARMFLORA ZUR IMMUNMODULATION[2019/15]
English:SELECTIVELY ALTERING MICROBIOTA FOR IMMUNE MODULATION[2019/15]
French:MODIFICATION SÉLECTIVE DU MICROBIOTE POUR UNE MODULATION IMMUNITAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2014124226  (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2016177682  (SNIPR TECH LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-5,7-12,17,18,21 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - NOBUHIKO KAMADA ET AL, "Role of the gut microbiota in immunity and inflammatory disease", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, GB, (20130501), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nri3430, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 321 - 335, XP055402377 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri3430
 [Y]  - L. V. HOOPER ET AL, "Interactions Between the Microbiota and the Immune System", SCIENCE, (20120608), vol. 336, no. 6086, doi:10.1126/science.1223490, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1268 - 1273, XP055030048 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * But see esp. p. 1270, right colum, from 3rd paragraph onwards. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1223490
 [Y]  - JUNE L. ROUND ET AL, "The gut microbiota shapes intestinal immune responses during health and disease", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, GB, (20090501), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nri2515, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 313 - 323, XP055252815 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri2515
 [Y]  - HYONGBUM KIM ET AL, "A guide to genome engineering with programmable nucleases", NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, (20140402), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nrg3686, ISSN 1471-0056, pages 321 - 334, XP055177064 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg3686
 [Y]  - A. A. GOMAA ET AL, "Programmable Removal of Bacterial Strains by Use of Genome-Targeting CRISPR-Cas Systems", MBIO, (20140128), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1128/mBio.00928-13, pages e00928 - 13, XP055227960 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/mBio.00928-13
 [Y]  - PAUL BG VAN ERP ET AL, "The history and market impact of CRISPR RNA-guided nucleases", CURRENT OPINION IN VIROLOGY, United Kingdom, (20150601), vol. 12, doi:10.1016/j.coviro.2015.03.011, ISSN 1879-6257, pages 85 - 90, XP055402267 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * * see esp. p. 87, right column, 2nd paragraph, and Fig. 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coviro.2015.03.011
 [Y]  - ROBERT J CITORIK ET AL, "Sequence-specific antimicrobials using efficiently delivered RNA-guided nucleases", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, GALE GROUP INC, US, vol. 32, no. 11, doi:10.1038/NBT.3011, ISSN 1087-0156, (20141101), pages 1141 - 1145, (20140921), XP002742964 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3011