Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469067

EP3469067 - RECOMBINANT YEAST CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PAPAPETRIDIS, Ioannis
c/o Technische Universiteit Delft - Sectie
Industriële Microbiologie
Afd. Biotechnologie
P.O.Box 5
2600 AA Delft / NL
02 / VAN MARIS, Antonius Jeroen Adriaan
Division of Industrial Biotechnology
School of Biotechnology KTH
Royal Institute of Technology
AlbaNova University Center
SE 106 91 Stockholm / SE
03 / PRONK, Jacobus Thomas
c/o Technische Universiteit Delft
Sectie Industriële Microbiologie Afd.
Biotechnologie
Van der Maasweg 9
2629 HZ Delft / NL
04 / DE WAAL, Paulus Petrus
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
05 / LAURET, Niels
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
06 / VERHOEVEN, Maarten D
c/o Technische Universiteit Delft
Sectie Industriële Microbiologie Afd.
Biotechnologie
Van der Maasweg 9
2629 HZ Delft / NL
07 / SCHMITZ, Jozef Petrus Johannes
P.O.Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732052.013.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64353
Priority number, dateWO2016EP17438214.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/174382
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216136
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469067
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/19, C12N9/12, C12N9/88, C12N15/81, C12P7/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:REKOMBINANTE HEFEZELLE[2019/16]
English:RECOMBINANT YEAST CELL[2019/16]
French:CELLULE DE LEVURE RECOMBINÉE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]AU2014201742  (KOHILO BIO INC, et al) [I] 15 * pages 13,17 *;
 [AD]WO2014129898  (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014033019  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-16 * page 18 *
by applicantWO2014129898
 WO2015107496
 WO2009013159
 WO2008041840
 WO2009112472
 WO2011010923
 EP0635574
 WO9846772
 WO9960102
 WO0037671
 WO9014423
 EP0481008
 US6265186
    - NISSEN et al., Yeast, (20000000), vol. 16, pages 463 - 474
    - SAMBROOK et al., Molecular Cloning-A Laboratory Manual, (19890000), vol. 1-3
    - "An overview of sequence comparison", KRUSKAL, J. B., Time warps, string edits and macromolecules: the theory and practice of sequence comparison, Addison Wesley, (19830000), pages 1 - 44
    - NEEDLEMAN, S. B.; WUNSCH, C. D., J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - RICE,P.; LONGDEN,L.; BLEASBY,A., "version 2.8.0 or higher, EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", Trends in Genetics, vol. 16, no. 6, (20000000), pages 276 - 277, URL: http://emboss.bioinformatics.nl
    - SHARP; LI, Nucleic Acids Research, (19870000), vol. 15, pages 1281 - 1295
    - JANSEN et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 2242 - 2251
    - HUGO YEBENES et al., Trends in Biochemical Sciences, (20110800), vol. 36, no. 8
    - ZEILSTRA-RYALLS J. et al, "The universally conserved GroE (Hsp60) chaperonins", Annu Rev Microbiol., (19910000), vol. 45, pages 301 - 325
    - HORWICH AL et al, "Two Families of Chaperonin: Physiology and Mechanism", Annu Rev Cell Dev Biol., (20070000), vol. 23, pages 115 - 145
    - KUIJPER, M et al., FEMS, Eukaryotic cell Research, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 925 - 934
    - KADAR et al., Appl. Biochem. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 136-140, pages 847 - 858
    - DICARLO et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20130000), pages 1 - 8
    - SIKORSKI; HIETER, Genetics, (19890000), vol. 122, pages 19 - 27
    - LUTTIK et al., Journal of Bacteriology, (20000000), vol. 182, no. 24, pages 501 - 517
    - ENTIAN KD; KOTTER P., "Yeast genetic strain and plasmid collections", Method Microbiol., (20070000), pages 629 - 666
    - NIJKAMP JF et al, "De novo sequencing, assembly and analysis of the genome of the laboratory strain Saccharomyces cerevisiae CEN.PK113-7D, a model for modern industrial biotechnology", Microb Cell Fact., (20120000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1186/1475-2859-11-36, page 36, XP021095614

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-11-36
    - VERDUYN C. et al, "Effect of benzoic acid on metabolic fluxes in yeasts: A continuous-culture study on the regulation of respiration and alcoholic fermentation", Yeast, (19920000), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1002/yea.320080703, pages 501 - 517, XP008082716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320080703
    - MANS R. et al, "CRISPR/Cas9: a molecular Swiss army knife for simultaneous introduction of multiple genetic modifications in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", FEMS Yeast Res., (20150000), vol. 15, page fov004, XP002762726
    - DICARLO JE et al, "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucleic Acids Res., (20130000), pages 1 - 8
    - MIKKELSEN MD et al, "Microbial production of indolylglucosinolate through engineering of a multi-gene pathway in a versatile yeast expression platform", Metab Eng., (20120000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2012.01.006, pages 104 - 111, XP028466090

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2012.01.006
    - KNIJNENBURG TA et al, "Combinatorial effects of environmental parameters on transcriptional regulation in Saccharomyces cerevisiae: A quantitative analysis of a compendium of chemostat-based transcriptome data", BMC Genomics, (20090000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2164-10-53, page 53, XP021047971

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2164-10-53
    - MUMBERG D; MULLER R; FUNK M., "Yeast vectors for the controlled expression of heterologous proteins in different genetic backgrounds", Gene, (19950000), vol. 156, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(95)00037-7, pages 119 - 122, XP004042399

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00037-7
    - GUELDENER U. et al, "A second set of loxP marker cassettes for Cre-mediated multiple gene knockouts in budding yeast", Nucleic Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, page e23, XP002676129

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/30.6.e23
    - GUADALUPE-MEDINA V. et al, "Carbon dioxide fixation by Calvin-Cycle enzymes improves ethanol yield in yeast", Biotechnol Biofuels, (20130000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1754-6834-6-125, page 125, XP021161929

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1754-6834-6-125
    - DANIEL GIETZ R; WOODS RA, "Transformation of yeast by lithium acetate/single-stranded carrier DNA/polyethylene glycol method", Methods Enzymol., (20020000), pages 87 - 96, XP008068319
    - SOLIS-ESCALANTE D. et al, "amdSYM, a new dominant recyclable marker cassette for Saccharomyces cerevisiae", FEMS Yeast Res, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 126 - 139
    - GUADALUPE-MEDINA V. et al, "Elimination of glycerol production in anaerobic cultures of a Saccharomyces cerevisiae strain engineered to use acetic acid as an electron acceptor", Appl Environ Microb., (20100000), vol. 76, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.01772-09, pages 190 - 195, XP002603125

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01772-09
    - PAPAPETRIDIS I. et al, "Improving ethanol yield in acetate-reducing Saccharomyces cerevisiae by cofactor engineering of 6-phosphogluconate dehydrogenase and deletion of ALD6", Microb Cell Fact., (20160000), vol. 15, pages 1 - 16
    - HEIJNEN JJ; VAN DIJKEN JP, "In search of a thermodynamic description of biomass yields for the chemotrophic growth of microorganisms", Biotechnol Bioeng., (19920000), vol. 39, pages 833 - 858
    - POSTMA E. et al, "Enzymic analysis of the crabtree effect in glucose-limited chemostat cultures of Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Appl Environ Microbiol., (19890000), vol. 55, pages 468 - 477
    - VERDUYN C. et al, "Physiology of Saccharomyces cerevisiae in anaerobic glucose-limited chemostat cultures", J Gen Microbiol., (19900000), vol. 136, pages 395 - 403
    - KWAST et al., "Genomic Analysis of Anaerobically induced genes in Saccharomyces cerevisiae: Functional roles of ROX1 and other factors in mediating the anoxic response", Journal of bacteriology, (20020000), vol. 184, no. 1, pages 250 - 265
    - KENG, T., "HAP1 and ROX1 form a regulatory pathway in the repression of HEM13 transcription in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Mol. Cell. Biol., (19920000), vol. 12, pages 2616 - 2623
    - "Tetrapyrrole and heme biosynthesis in the yeast Saccharomyces cerevisiae", LABBE-BOIS, R.; P. LABBE, Biosynthesis of heme and chlorophylls, McGraw-Hill, (19900000), pages 235 - 285
    - ZITOMER, R. S.; C. V. LOWRY, "Regulation of gene expression by oxygen in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Microbiol. Rev., (19920000), vol. 56, pages 1 - 11
    - ZITOMER, R. S. et al, "Regulation of hypoxic gene expression in yeast", Kidney Int., (19970000), vol. 51, pages 507 - 513
    - COHEN et al., "Induction and repression of DAN1 and the family of anaerobic mannoprotein genes in Saccharomyces cerevisiae occurs through a complex array of regulatory sites", Nucleic Acid Research, (20010000), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/29.3.799, pages 799 - 808, XP002555251

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.3.799
    - TER KINDE AND DE STEENSMA, "A microarray-assisted screen for potential Hap1 and Rox1 target genes in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Yeast, (20020000), vol. 19, pages 825 - 840
    - SERTIL et al., "The DAN1 gene of S cerevisiae is regulated in parallel with the hypoxic gene , but by a different mechanism", Gene, (19970000), vol. 192, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00028-0, pages 199 - 205, XP004081712

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00028-0
 WO2013EP56623
 WO2016EP50136
 EP20160194660