Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469067 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469067



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 390
05.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
10.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
21.12.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 36
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 62
06.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
05.07.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 6
13.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
13.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
13.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
13.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 53
13.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
13.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6
13.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5
13.06.2017 Incoming communication concerning PCT Direct PCT receiving Office 5
13.06.2017 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 81