Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469067


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
25.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
22.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.2018 Change - representative
10.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication