Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468380

EP3468380 - ANHYDROUS FOOD PRODUCT WITH A BASE OF COCOA BUTTER AND DRY PLANT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sonafi
42 Rue Rieussec
78220 Viroflay / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURGEAY, Julien
632 Route de Gaud
6 Lotissement "Les Jardins de Gaud"
26260 Saint Donat sur l'Herbasse / FR
02 / CLAVEYROLAT, Alban
11 Rue de la Sable
26300 Chateauneuf-sur-Isere / FR
03 / SAGLIO, Aurélie
2bis Rue Félix Herbet
77300 Fontainebleau / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3-5 Cours du Triangle
92036 Puteaux La Défense cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17732053.813.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64423
Priority number, dateFR2016005547014.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655470
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216166
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468380
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/36, A23G1/40, A23G1/46, A23G1/48, A23G1/52, A23G1/56, A23G9/46, A23G9/52
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:WASSERFREIES LEBENSMITTELPRODUKT MIT EINER BASIS AUS KAKAOBUTTER UND TROCKENEM PFLANZENMATERIAL[2019/16]
English:ANHYDROUS FOOD PRODUCT WITH A BASE OF COCOA BUTTER AND DRY PLANT MATERIAL[2019/16]
French:PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE ANHYDRE A BASE DE BEURRE DE CACAO ET DE MATIERE SECHE VEGETALE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]RU2566438  (G NAUCHNOE UCHREZHDENIE NII KONDITERSKOJ PROMY ROSSIJSKOJ AKADEMII SEL SKOKHOZJAJSTVENNYKH NAUK GNU [RU]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,9-14 [I] 5,6,9-14;
 [Y]FR1293121  (MICHEL RAMBAUD) [Y] 5,6,9-14 * the whole document * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH08266225  (NISSHIN OIL MILLS LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6143350  (DUBBERKE KARIN [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - AFOAKWA ET AL, "Factors influencing rheological and textural qualities in chocolate - a review", TRENDS IN FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB, (20070510), vol. 18, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.TIFS.2007.02.002, ISSN 0924-2244, pages 290 - 298, XP022069623 [Y] 5,6,9-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tifs.2007.02.002
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Chocolate Ganache (thick ganache, perfect to cover cakes!)", (20140523), URL: https://www.recipecommunity.com.au/desserts-sweets-recipes/chocolate-ganache-thick-ganache-perfect-to-cover-cakes/8cdj87xf-0278e-587624-cfcd2-jhh7s0c6, (20170118), XP055336721 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *