Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471875

EP3471875 - STORAGE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR CHLORINE STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TRIEU, Vinh
Grabengasse 6
50679 Köln / DE
02 / LANGSTEIN, Gerhard
Am Lingenstock 43
51515 Kürten / DE
03 / HEINZ, Paul
Dünenweg 33
51375 Leverkusen / DE
04 / WEBER, Rainer
Forststr. 15a
51519 Odenthal / DE
05 / SCHIESSER, Yuliya
Im grünen Anger 13
53844 Troisdorf / DE
06 / WERNER, Knud
Deswatinesstr. 86
47800 Krefeld / DE
07 / HAVERKAMP, Verena
Im Neuen Feld 33
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
08 / POLARZ, Sebastian
Sonnhalde 26
88709 Meersburg / DE
09 / SCHACHTSCHNEIDER, Andreas
Muntpratstrasse 8
78462 Konstanz / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17732074.419.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64903
Priority number, dateEP2016017534820.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16175348
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220476
Date:28.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471875
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/28, B01D53/02, C01B7/075, B01J20/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR CHLORSPEICHERUNG[2019/17]
English:STORAGE MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR CHLORINE STORAGE[2019/17]
French:MATÉRIAU D'EMMAGASINAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EMMAGASINER DU CHLORE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
21.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5500035  (ZARCHY ANDREW S [US] ET AL) [Y] 9-16 * column 1, line 28 - line 35 * * column 3, line 45 - line 54 * * column 14, line 24 - column 15, line 15; example III; table 2 * [A] 1-8;
 [AD]US5376164  (ZARCHY ANDREW S [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - C. BOISSIÈRE ET AL, "Spherical MSU-1 Mesoporous Silica Particles Tuned for HPLC", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, DE, (200104), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1002/1616-3028(200104)11:2<129::AID-ADFM129>3.0.CO;2-W, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 129 - 135, XP055329697 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 131; figures 2, 3 * * Abschnitt: "4. Experimental"; page 134, column left - column right *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1616-3028(200104)11:2<129::AID-ADFM129>3.0.CO;2-W
 [XY]  - A.I. CARRILLO ET AL, "Well-ordered mesoporous interconnected silica spheres prepared using extremely low surfactant concentrations", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, Switzerland, Taiwan, Republic of China, (20110524), vol. 129, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.matchemphys.2011.04.015, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 261 - 269, XP055329710 [X] 1-5 * page 267; table 5 * * Abschnitt: "4. Conclusions"; page 268, column righ * * Abschnitt: "1. Introduction"; page 261, column left * [Y] 9-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchemphys.2011.04.015
by applicantEP0741108
 US5376164
    - J. Phys. Chem., (19420000), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 31 - 35
    - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19980000), vol. 120, no. 24, pages 6024 - 6036