Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469183 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469183



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 161
25.11.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.11.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.11.2019 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
21.10.2019 Annex Search / examination 1
21.10.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
31.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.02.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.01.2018 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
12.01.2018 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
12.01.2018 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
12.01.2018 Request for the Recording of a Change (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
24.07.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
20.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
06.07.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.06.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.06.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 5
23.06.2017 Description International Searching Authority 13
23.06.2017 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
23.06.2017 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
23.06.2017 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
23.06.2017 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
23.06.2017 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
23.06.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 4