Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469183

EP3469183 - WELLHEAD FEED THROUGH APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICAL CABLE AND OTHER TYPES OF CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.11.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zilift Holdings Limited
17-19 Greenrole Trading Estate
Howe Moss Drive, Dyce
Aberdeen
Aberdeenshire AB21 0GL / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MACLEAN, Iain
11 Braemar Place
Aberdeen AB10 6EN / GB
02 / DENHOLM, Allan
-
deceased / GB
 [2019/49]
Former [2019/16]01 / MACLEAN, Iain
11 Braemar Place
Aberdeen AB10 6EN / GB
02 / DENHOLM, Allan
22 Ashwood Mews
Brigde of Don
Aberdeen AB22 8XS / GB
Representative(s)Docherty, Andrew John
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732158.513.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51721
Priority number, dateUS201662349685P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349685 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216546
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469183
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/038
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:BOHRLOCHKOPFDURCHFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHES KABEL UND ANDERE ARTEN VON LEITUNGEN[2019/16]
English:WELLHEAD FEED THROUGH APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICAL CABLE AND OTHER TYPES OF CONDUIT[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION DE TÊTE DE PUITS POUR UN CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE ET AUTRES TYPES DE CONDUIT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2015173319  (AKER SUBSEA AS [NO]) [X] 37,39 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 8 * * page 2, line 25 - line 29 * * page 10, line 8 - page 14, line 12; figure - * [A] 1-36;
 [X]US5140894  (SNYDER DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 37-39 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 6 *;
 [A]US2003056956  (COLLIE GRAEME JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0023]; figure - *