Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468418

EP3468418 - ADJUSTABLE BED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
18.10.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motus Mechanics Limited
Brent House
382 Gloucester Road
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL51 7AY / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Paul
24 Parr Lane
Eccleston
Chorley Lancashire PR7 5SL / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Salmon, Victoria Beatrice
The IP Asset Partnership Limited
Prama House
267 Banbury Road
Oxford OX2 7HT / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732159.313.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51722
Priority number, dateGB2016001021213.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610212
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216547
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468418
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A61G7/015
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERSTELLBARES BETT[2019/16]
English:ADJUSTABLE BED[2019/16]
French:LIT RÉGLABLE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2016058949  (MALVESTIO S P A [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,12,20,23 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-6 * [A] 4,10 [I] 13-19,21,22;
 [A]US2009178201  (LUJAN LEONARD D [US], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US5640730  (GODETTE ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-3,10-11 *;
 [X]US4996731  (KRUYT ROBERT A [CA]) [X] 1,10 * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 61; figures 1-8 *