Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472803

EP3472803 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING THE VALUE OF A PHYSICAL PARAMETER IN A BIOLOGICAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UCL Business PLC
The Network Building 97 Tottenham Court Road
London W1T 4TP / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Geoffrey
c/o UCL Business PLC The Network Building
97 Tottenham Court Road
London W1T 4TP / GB
02 / STOYANOV, Danail
c/o UCL Business PLC The Network Building
97 Tottenham Court Road
London W1T 4TP / GB
03 / ELSON, Dan
c/o UCL Business PLC The Network Building
97 Tottenham Court Road
London W1T 4TP / GB
04 / CLANCY, Neil
c/o UCL Business PLC The Network Building
97 Tottenham Court Road
London W1T 4TP / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17732200.519.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB51784
Priority number, dateGB2016001059417.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610594
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216585
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472803
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00, A61B1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES WERTES EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN PARAMETERS IN EINEM BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBE[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING THE VALUE OF A PHYSICAL PARAMETER IN A BIOLOGICAL TISSUE[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ESTIMATION DE LA VALEUR D'UN PARAMÈTRE PHYSIQUE DANS UN TISSU BIOLOGIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009052607  (PERCEPTRONIX MEDICAL INC [CA]; FAWZY YASSER SHERIF [CA]) [X] 34,35,37 * page 12, lines 4-10, 19-21; figures 2, 6 * * page 13, line 9 - page 14, line 7; figures 5,6 *;
 [I]US2014155717  (SAITO TAKAAKI [JP]) [I] 34,35,37 * paragraphs [0070] - [0074]; figures 5,6,15,16 *