Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3462903

EP3462903 - AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR LIVESTOCK ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nutreco Nederland B.V.
Veerstraat 38
5831 JN Boxmeer / NL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MARTÍN-TERESO LÓPEZ, Javier
18 Professor van Weliestraat
6524 NN NIJMEGEN / NL
02 / PENA CARVALHO DE CARVALHO, Isabela
57 Stieltjesstraat
6511 AJ NIJMEGEN / NL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17732254.207.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017NL50376
Priority number, dateNL2016201690907.06.2016         Original published format: NL 2016909
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213502
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3462903
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23K20/10, A23K20/22, A23K50/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR NUTZTIERE[2019/15]
English:AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR LIVESTOCK ANIMALS[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITION AQUEUSE POUR ANIMAUX D'ÉLEVAGE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US6299913  (BLOCK ELLIOT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8-11,13,14 * claims 1-18 *;
 [XI]US2002110621  (ROBERGS ROBERT A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,7,13,14,19,24,25,28 * the whole document * [I] 2,5,6,8-12;
 [XYI]US3241974  (RUDOLPH SEIDEN) [X] 1,2,9-23 * the whole document * [Y] 4,25 [I] 3-8,24-30;
 [Y]US5089477  (FREGLY MELVIN J [US] ET AL) [Y] 4,25 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5505968
 WO2004047553