Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469113

EP3469113 - METHOD FOR COATING A FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A PROTECTIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastraße 27c
80686 München / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FAHLAND, Matthias
Kastanienstraße 9
01257 Dresden / DE
02 / MEYER, Uwe
Mozartstr. 3
01477 Arnsdorf / DE
03 / VOGT, Tobias
Neuländerstaße 93
01129 Dresden / DE
04 / GÜNTHER, Steffen
Stadtgutstraße 1
01217 Dresden / DE
05 / FAHLTEICH, John
Österreicher Straße 83a
01279 Dresden / DE
06 / PRAGER, Nicole
Brunnenweg 12
01723 Grumbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / FAHLAND, Matthias
Kastanienstraße 9
01257 Dresden / DE
02 / MEYER, Uwe
Mozartstr. 3
01477 Arnsdorf / DE
03 / VOGT, Tobias
Weinbergstraße 56 A
01129 Dresden / DE
04 / GÜNTHER, Steffen
Stadtgutstraße 1
01217 Dresden / DE
05 / FAHLTEICH, John
Österreicher Straße 83a
01279 Dresden / DE
06 / PRAGER, Nicole
Brunnenweg 12
01723 Grumbach / DE
Application number, filing date17732345.808.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64030
Priority number, dateDE20161011073710.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110737
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211989
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469113
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/56, C23C16/54, B65H41/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINES MIT EINER SCHUTZFOLIE VERSEHENEN FLEXIBLEN SUBSTRATES[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR COATING A FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A PROTECTIVE FILM[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT FLEXIBLE MUNI D'UN FILM DE PROTECTION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2883822  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]JP2012177179  (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2015198701  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 3 *;
 [A]JP2014074221  (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP2228463  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0096]; figures 2A, 2B *
by applicantDE102008028542
 EP2228463