Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468894

EP3468894 - FILLING INSERT FOR A PACKET OF SMOKING ARTICLES, COMBINATION WITH A DRAWER, APPARATUS, MACHINE, BLANK, PACKET AND METHODS ASSOCIATED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GIMA TT S.p.A.
Via Tolara di Sotto 121/A
40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia (Bologna) / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DRAGHETTI, Fiorenzo
c/o GIMA TT S.P.A.
Via Tolara di Sotto 121/A
40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia / IT
02 / CAPORALE, Antonio
c/o GIMA TT S.P.A.
Via Tolara di Sotto 121/A
40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732359.913.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64413
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0435614.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164356
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216160
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468894
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/10, B65D5/496, B65B19/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FÜLLUNGSEINSATZ FÜR EINE PACKUNG VON RAUCHARTIKELN, KOMBINATION MIT EINER SCHUBLADE, VORRICHTUNG, ZUSCHNITT, PACKUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:FILLING INSERT FOR A PACKET OF SMOKING ARTICLES, COMBINATION WITH A DRAWER, APPARATUS, MACHINE, BLANK, PACKET AND METHODS ASSOCIATED[2019/16]
French:INSERT DE REMPLISSAGE POUR PAQUET D'ARTICLES À FUMER EN COMBINAISON AVEC UN TIROIR, APPAREIL, MACHINE, ÉBAUCHE, PAQUET ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.12.2018Observations by third parties
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE102015014182  (G D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI [IT]) [Y] 8,17,18 * paragraphs [0009] - [0061] * * figures 7,8,28 *;
 [A]WO2016083442  (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-20 * pages 1-4 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE102014116784  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0116] * * figures 1-22 *;
 [A]EP2982607  (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-22 *;
 [A]EP3025979  (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-5 *;
 [XY]WO2016088063  (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,7,19 * pages 1-14 * * figures 1-12 * [Y] 8,17,18;
 [X]WO2015114588  (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 20 * pages 1-18 * * figures 4-6 *;
 [Y]DE102014110440  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [Y] 8,17,18 * paragraphs [0099] , [0100] * * figures 1, 3, 4 *;
 [Y]DE102014007415  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [Y] 8,17,18 * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] * * figures 1, 3, 9 *
by applicantDE102015014182
 WO2016083442
 DE102014116784
 EP2982607
 EP3025979