Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3472338


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Change - applicant published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
05.07.2019 Change - representative
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
05.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
15.01.2019 Change - representative
15.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication