blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3472338
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019185848Global Dossier 20.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16001385 20.06.2016
LU93251 07.10.2016
WO2017EP65010 20.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3472338Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16001385 20.06.2016
LU93251 07.10.2016
WO2017EP65010 20.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017220527Global Dossier 28.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP16001385 20.06.2016
LU93251 07.10.2016