Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472338

EP3472338 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING MULTIPLE ALLELES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change - applicantpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Octapharma AG
Seidenstraße 2
8853 Lachen / CH
[2019/50]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NAWRATH, Karina
c/o Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
02 / GUENDEL, Janine
c/o Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
03 / BAHRKE, Sven
c/o Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
04 / STOECKL, Lars
c/o Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
05 / GOLETZ, Steffen
c/o Glycotope GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Str. 10
13125 Berlin / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann
PartG mbB
Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date17732381.320.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP65010
Priority number, dateEP2016000138520.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16001385
LU2016009325107.10.2016         Original published format: LU 93251
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220527
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472338
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/00, C07K14/745, C12N9/64, C12N15/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG MULTIPLER ALLELE[2019/17]
English:MEANS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING MULTIPLE ALLELES[2019/17]
French:MOYEN ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER DES ALLÈLES MULTIPLES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2015138855  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,18-21 * the whole document * [I] 8,11,12,22;
 [A]WO2014165612  (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2016081923  (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015010114  (LARIX BIOSCIENCE LLC [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2016091268  (UNIV COPENHAGEN [DK], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [XPI]WO2016100309  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [XP] 1,4,6,9,10,18 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,11-13;
 [XP]WO2016196499  (CLARK ATLANTA UNIV [US]) [XP] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - JAMES R. BUTLER ET AL, "Silencing the porcine iGb3s gene does not affect Gal [alpha] 3Gal levels or measures of anticipated pig-to-human and pig-to-primate acute rejection", XENOTRANSPLANTATION, US, (20160311), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1111/xen.12217, ISSN 0908-665X, pages 106 - 116, XP055378294 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/xen.12217
 [T]  - GINO STOLFA ET AL, "Using CRISPR-Cas9 to quantify the contributions of O-glycans, N-glycans and Glycosphingolipids to human leukocyte-endothelium adhesion", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20160726), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep30392, XP055378095 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep30392
by applicantWO2008028686
 WO2016193083
    - ISHINO Y et al., J Bacteriol., (19871200), vol. 169, no. 12, pages 5429 - 33
    - JINEK et al., Science, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821
    - OWENS, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20010000), vol. 98, pages 1471 - 1476