Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464990

EP3464990 - NON-REFILLABLE GAS CYLINDER SECURED AGAINST FILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guilbert Express
33 Av. du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny
94120 Fontenay Sous Bois / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GUILLOU, Yves
rue des Chênes
Bâtiment J2
77177 Brou sur Chantereine / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17732496.923.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51277
Priority number, dateFR2016005475226.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1654752
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203162
Date:30.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464990
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F17C13/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:GEGEN DAS BEFÜLLEN GESICHERTER NICHT WIEDERBEFÜLLBARER GASZYLINDER[2019/15]
English:NON-REFILLABLE GAS CYLINDER SECURED AGAINST FILLING[2019/15]
French:BOUTEILLE À GAZ NON RECHARGEABLE PROTÉGÉE CONTRE LE REMPLISSAGE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2018National basic fee paid 
20.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0768485  (AMTROL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [XY]WO2005060504  (AMTROL INC [US]; PIETTE SCOTT [US]; VANHAAREN CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US2005082501  (CHEN DE F [CN]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0021] - [0031]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2655955  (ALFAX AB [SE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0401072  (AIR LIQUIDE) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 17 - column 6, line 15 *
by applicantEP1421304