Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469400

EP3469400 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING AN UNDERWATER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Submarine Open Technologies
4 Allée du Levant
Centre commercial Le Solis Bat 1
Bureau Elytis
34970 Lattes / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CODOL, Jean-Marie
c/o SUBMARINE OPEN TECHNOLOGIES
Bureau Elytis - Centre Commercial Le Solis
4, allée du Levant
34970 LATTES / FR
02 / CHANZY, Moïra
c/o SUBMARINE OPEN TECHNOLOGIES
Bureau Elytis - Centre Commercial Le Solis
4, allée du Levant
34970 LATTES / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / CODOL, Jean-Marie
29 Impasse de Croupillac
30100 Ales / FR
02 / CHANZY, Moïra
29 Impasse de Croupillac
30100 Ales / FR
Representative(s)Cornuejols, Georges
Cassiopi
230 Avenue de l'Aube Rouge
34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732525.509.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51458
Priority number, dateFR2016005530609.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655306
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212182
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469400
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/39, G01S5/00, G01S5/30
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER UNTERWASSERVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING AN UNDERWATER DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF SOUS-MARIN[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5331602  (MCLAREN CRAIG B [US]) [X] 1-4,8-14,16 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,15;
 [XI]US5119341  (YOUNGBERG JAMES W [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 4, line 31 - column 9, line 67; figure -; claim - * [I] 5,9-16;
 [XI]US2009196122  (CROWELL JONATHAN C [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraphs [0030] - [0061]; figure -; claim - * [I] 5-7,9-13,16;
 [A]FR2785993  (THOMAS HUBERT [FR]) [A] 1,16 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9414081  (THOMAS HUBERT [FR]) [A] 1,16 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantUS8654610