Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469223

EP3469223 - ROTATING MASS ENERGY STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carson, Abigail
65 West End
Brampton
Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE28 4SG / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Abraham, Richard , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732539.606.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51631
Priority number, dateGB2016001020411.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610204
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212244
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469223
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16C32/04, F16F15/30, F16F15/315, H02K7/02, H02K7/09
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DREHMASSEENERGIESPEICHER[2019/16]
English:ROTATING MASS ENERGY STORE[2019/16]
French:ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE À MASSE TOURNANTE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP2648319  (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0033] , [0042] - [0049]; figures 1b, 8a-11 * [Y] 11 [I] 4-10;
 [Y]CN203836075U  (ZHANG TIELIN) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [X]CN101409478  (HAOTIAN SUN [CN]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-6; claims 1-9 *;
 [X]WO0184693  (INDIGO ENERGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 8 *;
 [XA]DE102011116690  (OSTERLITZ VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1; claims 1-5 * [A] 4-11