Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468392

EP3468392 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF AN INSERT IN ROD-LIKE ARTICLES OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Tobacco Machinery Poland Sp. z o.o.
ul. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2
26-600 Radom / PL
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CIESLIKOWSKI, Bartosz
Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2
26-600 Radom / PL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Markieta, Jaroslaw Franciszek
Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych
J. Markieta, M. Zielinska-Lazarowicz Sp. p.
Bukowinska 2 lok 160
02-703 Warszawa / PL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732570.116.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB52867
Priority number, datePL2016041751110.06.2016         Original published format: PL 41751116
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212358
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468392
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/34
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES EINSATZES IN STABFÖRMIGEN ARTIKELN DER TABAKVERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE[2019/16]
English:APPARATUS FOR DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF AN INSERT IN ROD-LIKE ARTICLES OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D'UN INSERT DANS DES ARTICLES EN FORME DE TIGE DE L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102011006449  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0014] , [0016] , [0018] , [0021] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2015135610  (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 15, lines 27-31; figures 1,8 * * page 16, lines 19-32 *;
 [A]US2016091301  (HOFFMANN HANS-REINER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042]; figure 8 *;
 [A]DE102014211575  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037]; figures 1,2a,2b *;
 [A]DE2542082  (GALLAHER LTD) [A] 1-8 * page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2 *