Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468661

EP3468661 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND RESPONDING TO P-WAVE OVERSENSING IN A CARDIAC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Xusheng
710 Medtronic Parkway NE.
Minneapolis Minnesota 55432 / US
02 / DEGROOT, Paul J.
710 Medtronic Parkway NE.
Minneapolis Minnesota 55432 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732647.701.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US35417
Priority number, dateUS201662347177P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347177 P
US20171549510424.04.2017         Original published format: US201715495104
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213952
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468661
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/39, A61N1/365, A61N1/37, A61B5/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON UND REAKTION AUF P-WELLEN-OVERSENSING IN EINEM HERZSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND RESPONDING TO P-WAVE OVERSENSING IN A CARDIAC SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE RÉPONSE À UNE SUR-DÉTECTION D'ONDE P DANS UN SYSTÈME CARDIAQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2018National basic fee paid 
04.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US7139604  (MOUCHAWAR NABIL A [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 28 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 19 * * column 7, line 48 - column 10, line 53 * * column 11, lines 4-17 * * column 12, lines 12-29 * * column 13, line 14 - column 14, line 54 * [A] 2-6,12 [I] 7,10,11,13-15;
 [A]US2012226179  (STADLER ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006104849  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US9168380  (GREENHUT SAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7761150
 US2015306375
 US2015306410
 US5354316
 US5545186
 US6393316
 US7031771
 US8160684
 US8437842
 US8825145
 US8965505
 US8983586