Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468956

EP3468956 - 6-HYDROXY-5-(PHENYL/HETEROARYLSULFONYL)PYRIMIDIN-4(1H)-ONE AS APJ AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TORA, George, O.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
02 / FINLAY, Heather
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
03 / JIANG, Wen
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
04 / MENG, Wei
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
05 / ZHANG, Xiaojun
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / TORA, George, O.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
350 Carter Road
Hopewell, NJ 08534 / US
02 / FINLAY, Heather
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
350 Carter Road
Hopewell, NJ 08534 / US
03 / JIANG, Wen
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
350 Carter Road
Hopewell, NJ 08534 / US
04 / MENG, Wei
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
350 Carter Road
Hopewell, NJ 08534 / US
05 / ZHANG, Xiaojun
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
350 Carter Road
Hopewell, NJ 08534 / US
Representative(s)Kling, Edouard
Swords Laboratories, Ireland
Swiss Branch, Steinhausen
Hinterbergstrasse 16
6312 Steinhausen / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732693.114.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37405
Priority number, dateUS201662349692P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349692 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218633
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468956
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/60, C07D401/12, A61K31/513, A61K31/506, A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D471/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Validation statesMA22.11.2018
MD22.11.2018
TitleGerman:6-HYDROXY-5-(PHENYL/HETEROARYLSULFONYL)PYRIMIDIN-4(1H)-ON ALS APJ-AGONISTEN[2019/16]
English:6-HYDROXY-5-(PHENYL/HETEROARYLSULFONYL)PYRIMIDIN-4(1H)-ONE AS APJ AGONISTS[2019/16]
French:6-HYDROXY-5-(PHÉNYL/HÉTÉROARYLSULFONYL) PYRIMIDIN-4(1H)-ONE UTILISÉE EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DE L'APJ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2015184011  (SANFORD BURNHAM MED RES INST [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2017096130  (BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY [US]) [AP] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Database: ChemSpider (ChemZoo, Inc.), REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080608), Database accession no. 1026643-26-4, XP002772186 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract *
by applicant   - ROGER, V.L. et al., Circulation, (20120000), vol. 125, no. I, pages e2 - e220
    - ROGER, V.L. et al., JAMA, (20040000), vol. 292, no. 3, pages 344 - 350
    - BORLAUG, B.A. et al., Eur. Heart J., (20110000), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 670 - 679
    - JAPP, A.G. et al., Biochem. Pharmacol., (20080000), vol. 75, no. 10, pages 1882 - 1892
    - CHARO, D.N. et al., Am. J. Physiol. Heart Circ. Physiol.,, (20090000), vol. 297, no. 5, pages H1904 - H1913
    - KUBA, K. et al., Circ. Res., (20070000), vol. 101, no. 4, pages e32 - 42
    - BERRY, M.F., Circulation, (20040000), vol. 110, no. 11, pages II187 - II193
    - ASHLEY, E.A., Cardiovasc. Res., (20050000), vol. 65, no. 1, pages 73 - 82
    - CHENG, X. et al., Eur. J. Phαrmacol.,, (20030000), vol. 470, no. 3, pages 171 - 175
    - JAPP, A.G. et al., Circulation, (20100000), vol. 121, no. 16, pages 1818 - 1827
    - TATEMOTO, K., Regul. Pept., (20010000), vol. 99, no. 2-3, pages 87 - 92
    - SIMPKIN, J.C., Basic Res. Cardiol., (20070000), vol. 102, no. 6, pages 518 - 528
    - SIDDIQUEE, K. et al., J. Hypertens., (20110000), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 724 - 731
    - SCIMIA, M.C. et al., Nature, (20120000), vol. 488, no. 7411, pages 394 - 398
    - KOGUCHI, W. et al., Circ. J., (20120000), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 137 - 144
    - SARZANI, R. et al., J. Card. Fail., (20070000), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 521 - 529
    - The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, Academic Press, (19810000), vol. 3
    - WIDDER, K. et al., Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (19850000), vol. 112, pages 309 - 396
    - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", BUNDGAARD, H. et al., A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, Harwood Academic Publishers, (19910000), pages 113 - 191
    - BUNDGAARD, H., Adv. Drug Deliv. Rev., (19920000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38
    - BUNDGAARD, H. et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19880000), vol. 77, page 285
    - KAKEYA, N. et al., Chem. Pharm. Bull., (19840000), vol. 32, page 692
    - RAUTIO, J., Prodrugs and Targeted Delivery (Methods and Principles in Medicinal Chemistry), Wiley-VCH, (20110000), vol. 47
    - PITKIN, S.L. et al., Pharmacol. Rev., (20100000), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 331 - 342
    - KLEINZ, J.M. et al., Pharmacol. Ther., (20050000), vol. 107, no. 2, pages 198 - 211
    - TATEMOTO, K. et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19980000), vol. 255, pages 471 - 476
    - MAGUIRE, J.J. et al., Hypertension, (20090000), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 598 - 604
    - CHUN, A.J. et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20080000), vol. 118, no. 10, pages 3343 - 3354
    - ALLEN, JR., L.V. et al., Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, Pharmaceutical Press, (20120000), vol. 2