Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472813

EP3472813 - SMOKE DETECTION METHODOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
13995 Pasteur Blvd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FANG, Hui
Room 3502 Kerry Parkside Office
No. 1155 Fang Dian Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 201204 / CN
02 / XI, Jie
Room 3502 Kerry Parkside Office
No. 1155 Fang Dian Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 201204 / CN
03 / HARRIS, Peter, R.
411Silver Lane
MS 129-22
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
04 / VENUGOPALAN, Vivek
42578 Pelican Drive
South Riding, VA 20152 / US
05 / LINCOLN, David, L.
411 Silver Lane
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
 [2019/18]
Former [2019/17]01 / FANG, Hui
Room 3502 Kerry Parkside Office
No. 1155 Fang Dian Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 201204 / CN
02 / XI, Jie
Room 3502 Kerry Parkside Office
No. 1155 Fang Dian Road
Pudong New Area
Shanghai 201204 / CN
03 / HARRIS, Peter, R.
411Silver Lane
MS 129-22
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
04 / VENUGOPALAN, Vivek
411 Silver Lane
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
05 / LINCOLN, David, L.
411 Silver Lane
East Hartford, CT 06108 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17732712.915.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37659
Priority number, dateUS201662350418P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350418 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218763
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472813
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G08B17/107, G08B21/18
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:RAUCHDETEKTIONSMETHODE[2019/17]
English:SMOKE DETECTION METHODOLOGY[2019/17]
French:MÉTHODOLOGIE DE DÉTECTION DE FUMÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]DE102011108389  (PPP KB PRIBOR LTD [RU]) [I] 1-22 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094]; figures 10-12 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0082] *;
 [IA]US2010118303  (NAGASHIMA TETSUYA [JP]) [I] 10-22 * paragraph [0310]; figures 18-21 * * paragraph [0312] * * paragraph [0231] - paragraph [0243]; figure 26 * [A] 1-9;
 [A]US2008258925  (SIBER BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007229824  (POLITZE HEINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 *