Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468435

EP3468435 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FOOD PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vorwerk&Co. Interholding GmbH
Rauental 38
42270 Wuppertal / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KÖNNINGS, Maximilian
Teienstr. 68
8706 Meilen / CH
02 / RESENDE, Maria
Rua Maria Brown 11-3B
1500-431 Lissabon / PT
03 / YAN, Wenjie
Ottweilerstraße 32
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/17]
Former [2019/16]01 / KÖNNINGS, Maximilian
Forchstr. 127
8032 Zürich / CH
02 / RESENDE, Maria
Rua Maria Brown 11-3B
1500-431 Lissabon / PT
03 / YAN, Wenjie
Ottweilerstraße 32
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732800.208.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63990
Priority number, dateDE20161011071010.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110710
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211969
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468435
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47J43/07, A47J43/046, A47J27/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KÜCHENMASCHINE[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A FOOD PROCESSOR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN ROBOT MÉNAGER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2014016117  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [X] 1-16,18-21,24,25 * page 2, line 11 - page 11, line 11; figures 1-5 * * page 21, line 4 - page 25, line 22 * [I] 22,23;
 [XP]WO2016142405  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [XP] 1-16,18-21,24,25 * page 1, line 12 - page 9, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [P]DE102015103596  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [P] * the whole document *;
 [XI]WO2016016337  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [X] 25 * page 8, line 14 - page 13, line 5 * [I] 1-24
by applicantDE102013106691