Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468936

EP3468936 - HYDRATION CONTROL MIXTURE FOR MORTAR AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DENGLER, Joachim
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
02 / HESSE, Christoph
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
03 / SEUFERT, Sebastian
Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32
83308 Trostberg / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17732809.309.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64170
Priority number, dateEP2016017371409.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173714
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212044
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468936
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/04, C04B28/06, C04B28/14, C04B28/16, C04B103/22, C04B111/00, C04B111/27, C04B111/28, C04B111/60, C04B111/62, C04B111/70, C04B111/72
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HYDRIERUNGSSTEUERUNGSMISCHUNG FÜR MÖRTEL- UND ZEMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/16]
English:HYDRATION CONTROL MIXTURE FOR MORTAR AND CEMENT COMPOSITIONS[2019/16]
French:MÉLANGE RÉGULATEUR D'HYDRATATION POUR COMPOSITIONS DE MORTIER ET DE CIMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO0014026  (FOSROC INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-28 * page 2, line 21 - line 32; examples 1-3 * * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 15 *;
 [YD]EP0650940  (TOYO KAGAKU KK [JP]) [YD] 1-28 * example 8 *;
 [ID]JPH11116956  (TAKI CHEMICAL) [ID] 1-12,18,24,28 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] *;
 [Y]US6740155  (BOGGS BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * claim 4 *
by applicantUS5685903
 US4661159
 US7338990
 US6827776
 WO0023395
 WO0014026
 EP0650940
 JPH11116956
 WO2008012438
 EP0894811
 EP1851256
 EP2463314
 EP0753488
 CA2172004
 DE4411797
 US4430469
 US6555683
 CH686186
 WO2009103579
 WO2010026155
 WO2014114784
 WO2014114782
 DE2359291
    - ZURBRIGGEN, R. et al, "Mixed-binder based self-levelling flooring compounds: Critical formulations - the reason for typical damages", Ibausil Weimar, (20060000), vol. 16
    - Lea's Chemistry of Cement and Concrete. 4th ed., (20070000), pages 241 - 274
    - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry. 5th Ed., VCH, (19960000), vol. A8, page 586,587
    - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry. 5th ed., VCH, (19960000), vol. A2, page 131
    - Concrete Admixtures Handbook -Properties, Science and Technology, pages 411 - 412
    - J. PLANK et al., J. Appl. Poly. Sci., (20090000), pages 2018 - 2024
    - Concrete Admixtures Handbook -Properties, Science and Technology, Elsevier, (20130000), pages 411 - 413
 EP20140198721