Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472301

EP3472301 - CELL CULTURE DEVICE AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mimetas B.V.
19 J.H. Oortweg
2333 CH Leiden / NL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VULTO, Paul
19 J.H. Oortweg
2333 CH Leiden / NL
02 / TRIETSCH, Sebastiaan Johannes
19 J.H. Oortweg
2333 CH Leiden / NL
03 / NICOLAS, Arnaud
19 J.H. Oortweg
2333 CH Leiden / NL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17732821.812.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64302
Priority number, dateNL2016201696515.06.2016         Original published format: NL 2016965
NL2016201803321.12.2016         Original published format: NL 2018033
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017216113
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3472301
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/32, C12M3/06, C12N5/071
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ZELLKULTURVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:CELL CULTURE DEVICE AND METHODS[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉS DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2013085909  (RES TRIANGLE INST [US]; UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11,14,15,22-27,29,30,32-34,36,37,40-53,55,57-68,86-88 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 12 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 6 * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 5 * * page 16, line 11 - page 17, line 6 * * page 18, line 1 - line 18 * * figures 1,4,5a,5g,6; claims 1,6 * [A] 69-85 [I] 6,7,12,13,16-21,28,31,35,38,39,54,56;
 [XI]WO2016081751  (NORTIS INC [US]) [X] 69-75,78-80,82,83,85-88 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 11 * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 13; figures 1A-2F, 4A-4D * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 21 * [I] 76,77,81,84;
 [XI]WO2016077277  (US GOVERNMENT [US]) [X] 69-71,73-75,78-80,82,83,85-88 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 76,77,81,84;
 [A]US2015238952  (VULTO PAUL [NL] ET AL) [A] 1-68,86-88 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0107]; figures 18-22 *;
 [A]  - EDINSON LUCUMI MORENO ET AL, "Differentiation of neuroepithelial stem cells into functional dopaminergic neurons in 3D microfluidic cell culture", LAB ON A CHIP, (20150101), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1039/C5LC00180C, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 2419 - 2428, XP055246564 [A] 1-68,86-88 * page 2419 - page 2421; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5LC00180C
 [A]  - PAUL VULTO ET AL, "Phaseguides: a paradigm shift in microfluidic priming and emptying", LAB ON A CHIP, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 9, doi:10.1039/c0lc00643b, ISSN 1473-0197, page 1596, XP055091039 [A] 1-68 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0lc00643b
by applicantWO2010031194
 WO2008079320
 WO2013151616
 WO2010086179
 WO2012120101
 WO2007008609
 WO2014038943
 US4829000
    - SHOICHI DATE; TOSHIRO SATO, "Mini-Gut Organoids: Reconstitution of the Stem Cell Niche", Annu. Rev. Cell Dev. Biol., (20150000), vol. 31, pages 269 - 289
    - M. A. LANCASTER et al., Nature, (20130000), vol. 501, pages 373 - 379
    - M. TAKASATO et al., Nature, (20150000), vol. 526, pages 564 - 568
    - PAMPALONI et al., Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, (20070000), vol. 8, pages 839 - 84
    - Nature Protocols, (20120000), vol. 7, pages 1709 - 1715
    - LEE; MOONEY, Chem Rev, (20010000), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 1869 - 1880
    - QUARANTA et al., Curr. Opin. Cell Biol, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 674 - 681
    - Life Technologies, pages 15630 - 122