Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472302

EP3472302 - IMPROVED DIFFERENTIATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Nederlandse Akademie van Wetenschappen
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 CT Utrecht / NL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CLEVERS, Johannes Carolus
Hubrecht Institute
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 Utrecht / NL
02 / BEUMER, Joep
Hubrecht Institute
Uppsalalaan 8
3584 Utrecht / NL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17732860.620.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP65101
Priority number, dateGB2016001074820.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610748
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220586
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472302
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/071, A61K31/4427
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN DIFFERENTIATION[2019/17]
English:IMPROVED DIFFERENTIATION METHOD[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DIFFÉRENTIATION AMÉLIORÉ[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2014159356  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US]; MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [I] 1-11,13-30,36-38 * paragraph [00148]; figures 12A, 12B; example 1 * * paragraph [00158] - paragraph [00162]; example 3 * * page 5 - page 6 * * page 20 - page 23 * [A] 12,31-35,39,40;
 [A]WO2010090513  (KONINK NL AKADEMIE VAN WETENSC [NL]; SATO TOSHIRO [NL]; CLEVENS JOHANN) [A] 1-40 * page 53 - page 54 *;
 [A]EP2772534  (NAT UNIV CORP TOKYO MED & DENT [JP]) [A] 1-40 * paragraph [0087] *
 [A]  - XIAOLEI YIN ET AL, "Niche-independent high-purity cultures of Lgr5+ intestinal stem cells and their progeny", NATURE METHODS, (20131201), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1038/nmeth.2737, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 106 - 112, XP055292181 [A] 1-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2737
 [A]  - SIMON J. A. BUCZACKI ET AL, "Intestinal label-retaining cells are secretory precursors expressing Lgr5", NATURE, (20130227), vol. 495, no. 7439, doi:10.1038/nature11965, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 65 - 69, XP055407429 [A] 1-40 * page 69, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11965