blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472302 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472302



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 608
20.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
20.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 68
20.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
20.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 118
20.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
20.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
07.07.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
05.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
05.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
05.10.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 193
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.12.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 6
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 128
05.11.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
18.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.01.2019 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 6
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.08.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
14.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
14.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
14.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
14.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2