Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463672

EP3463672 - SEALING DEVICE FOR A WASTE PROCESSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bertin Technologies
10 bis, Avenue Ampère Parc d'Activités du Pas du Lac
78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BESNARD, Jacques
7 rue Jean Antoine Chaptal
78370 Plaisir / FR
02 / ROCH, Jean
83 chem Renard
13109 Simiane Collongue / FR
03 / LORECKI, Boguslaw
7 Les Cardelines
13850 Greasque / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Decobert, Jean-Pascal
Cabinet Hautier
Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention
20, rue de la Liberté
06000 Nice / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17732974.524.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51289
Priority number, dateFR2016005474126.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1654741
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203172
Date:30.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463672
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B02C18/24, B02C19/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ABFALLVERARBEITUNGSMASCHINE[2019/15]
English:SEALING DEVICE FOR A WASTE PROCESSING MACHINE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE POUR AUTOMATE DE BANALISATION DE DECHETS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB1086650  (THOMAS CROPPER RYLEY SHEPHERD) [X] 1,5,13,14 * page 1, column l, line 9 - line 10 * * page 1, column l, line 27 - line 32 * * page 2, column l, line 6 - column r, line 125 * * figure . * [A] 2-4,6-12;
 [A]WO9220450  (ECOMED INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2012066530  (CELITRON MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES [HU]; CARMEL ITZHAK [IL]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1a-1c,3a,3b,4a-4c *;
 [A]EP1520592  (TECNO SERVICE FIRST S R L [SM]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *
by applicantWO2013110900