Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468986

EP3468986 - INCREASING PLANT GROWTH AND YIELD BY USING A PHENYLALANINE AMMONIA LYASE SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Benson Hill Biosystems, Inc.
P.O. Box 13487
100 Capitola Drive
Suite 240
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAY, Benjamin Neil
1177 Great Ridge Parkway
Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US
02 / PRIEST, Henry D.
1619 Hurstborough Manor Drive
Hazelwood, Missouri 63042 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Inspicos P/S
Kogle Allé 2
2970 Hørsholm / DK
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733040.412.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53467
Priority number, dateUS201662349313P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349313 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216704
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468986
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/415, C12N15/82
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:STEIGERUNG DES PFLANZENWACHSTUMS UND ERTRAGS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER PHENYLALANINAMMONIUMLYASESEQUENZ[2019/16]
English:INCREASING PLANT GROWTH AND YIELD BY USING A PHENYLALANINE AMMONIA LYASE SEQUENCE[2019/16]
French:AUGMENTATION DE LA CROISSANCE ET DE LA PRODUCTIVITÉ DES PLANTES EN UTILISANT UNE SÉQUENCE DE PHÉNYLALANINE AMMONIAC LYASE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2012103555  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]; LOQUE DOMINIQUE [US]; SCHELLER HENRIK VIBE [US]) [X] 3-7,10-15 * figure 1; claims 9-10,15-20; sequence 99 * [Y] 1,2,8,9;
 [XY]WO03000906  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]; GLAZEBROOK JANE [US]; BRIGGS STEVEN [) [X] 3-7,10-15 * claims 1-31, 43-45; sequences 570, 696, 1291 * [Y] 1,2,8,9;
 [Y]WO2011015985  (EVOGENE LTD [IL]; AYAL SHARON [IL]; VINOCUR BASIA JUDITH [IL]; DIBER A) [Y] 1-15 * claims 3-22; sequence 8682 *;
 [Y]  - HOWLES P A ET AL, "Overexpression of L-phenylalanine ammonia-lyase in transgenic tobacco plants reveals control points for flux into phenylpropanoid biosynthesis", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, USA, (19960101), vol. 112, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1617 - 1624, XP002961960 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - BOUDET ET AL, "Evolution and current status of research in phenolic compounds", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (20071101), vol. 68, no. 22-24, doi:10.1016/J.PHYTOCHEM.2007.06.012, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 2722 - 2735, XP022376121 [Y] 1-15 * page 2724, paragraph 2 - page 2725, paragraph 1 * * page 2729, paragraph last - page 2731, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phytochem.2007.06.012
 [Y]  - MEYER JACQUELINE ET AL, "Signals that stop the rot: Regulation of secondary metabolite defences in cereals", PHYSIOLOGICAL AND MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, (20150620), vol. 94, doi:10.1016/J.PMPP.2015.05.011, ISSN 0885-5765, pages 156 - 166, XP029631883 [Y] 1-15 * page 159, paragraph first *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pmpp.2015.05.011
by applicantUS6015891
 WO2012142371
 US5659026
 US7674952
 US8455718
 US7642347
 US5563055
 US5981840
 US4945050
 US5879918
 US5886244
 US5932782
 WO0028058
 US5240855
 US5322783
 US5324646
 US5736369
 WO2013026740
    - MYERS; MILLER, CABIOS, (19880000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17
    - SMITH et al., Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448
    - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268
    - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877
    - HIGGINS et al., Gene, (19880000), vol. 73, pages 237 - 244
    - HIGGINS et al., CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153
    - CORPET et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19880000), vol. 16, pages 10881 - 90
    - HUANG et al., CABIOS, (19920000), vol. 8, pages 155 - 65
    - PEARSON et al., Meth. Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 307 - 331
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, page 3389
    - ZHANG et al., Gene, (19910000), vol. 105, pages 61 - 72
    - MURRAY et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 477 - 508
    - RÖSLER et al., Plant Physiol, (19970000), vol. 113, pages 175 - 179
    - KOVACIK et al., J Plant Physiol, (20120000), vol. 169, pages 1317 - 1320
    - ODELL et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812
    - MCELROY et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 163 - 171
    - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19890000), vol. 12, pages 619 - 632
    - CHRISTENSEN et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689
    - LAST et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19910000), vol. 81, pages 581 - 588
    - VELTEN et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 2730
    - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant J., (19970000), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 255 - 265
    - KAWAMATA et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19970000), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 792 - 803
    - HANSEN et al., Mol. Gen Genet., (19970000), vol. 254, no. 3, pages 337 - 343
    - RUSSELL et al., Transgenic Res., (19970000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 157 - 168
    - RINEHART et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 3, pages 1331 - 1341
    - VAN CAMP et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 525 - 535
    - CANEVASCINI et al., Plant Physiol., (19960000), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 513 - 524
    - YAMAMOTO et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19940000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 773 - 778
    - Results Probl. Cell Differ., (19940000), vol. 20, pages 181 - 196
    - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138
    - MATSUOKA et al., Proc Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590
    - GUEVARA-GARCIA et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 495 - 505
    - KWON et al., Plant Physiol., (19940000), vol. 105, pages 357 - 67
    - GOTOR et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 509 - 18
    - OROZCO et al., Plant Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1129 - 1138
    - MATSUOKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, no. 20, pages 9586 - 9590
    - GAN; AMASINO, Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 1986 - 1988
    - RINEHART et al., Plant Physiol, (19960000), vol. 112, pages 1331 - 1341
    - GRAY-MITSUMUNE et al., Plant Mol Biol, (19990000), vol. 39, pages 657 - 669
    - BEAUDOIN; ROTHSTEIN, Plant Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 33, pages 835 - 846
    - GENSCHIK et al., Gene, (19940000), vol. 148, pages 195 - 202
    - YI et al., Planta, (20100000), vol. 232, pages 743 - 754
    - YAMAGUCHI-SHINOZAKI; SHINOZAKI, Mol Gen Genet, (19930000), vol. 236, pages 331 - 340
    - KHURANA et al., PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, page e54418
    - TAO et al., Plant Mol Biol Rep, (20150000), vol. 33, pages 200 - 208
    - VIRET et al., Proc Natl Acad USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 8577 - 8581
    - SATTARZADEH et al., Plant Biotechnol J, (20100000), vol. 8, pages 112 - 125
    - ENGELMANN et al., Plant Physiol, (20080000), vol. 146, pages 1773 - 1785
    - MATSUOKA et al., Plant J, (19940000), vol. 6, pages 311 - 319
    - VANDEPOELE et al., Plant Physiol, (20090000), vol. 150, pages 535 - 546
    - RUSHTON et al., Plant Cell, (20020000), vol. 14, pages 749 - 762
    - VENTER, Trends Plant Sci, (20070000), vol. 12, pages 118 - 124
    - GUERINEAU et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19910000), vol. 262, pages 141 - 144
    - PROUDFOOT, Cell, (19910000), vol. 64, pages 671 - 674
    - SANFACON et al., Genes Dev., (19910000), vol. 5, pages 141 - 149
    - MOGEN et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 1272
    - MUNROE et al., Gene, (19900000), vol. 91, pages 151 - 158
    - BALLAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19890000), vol. 17, pages 7891 - 7903
    - JOSHI et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, pages 9627 - 9639
    - CROSSWAY et al., Biotechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, pages 320 - 334
    - RIGGS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19860000), vol. 83, pages 5602 - 5606
    - PASZKOWSKI et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, pages 2717 - 2722
    - MCCABE et al., Biotechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 923 - 926
    - WEISSINGER et al., Ann. Rev. Genet., (19880000), vol. 22, pages 421 - 477
    - SANFORD et al., Particulate Science and Technology, (19870000), vol. 5, pages 27 - 37
    - CHRISTOU et al., Plant Physiol., (19880000), vol. 87, pages 671 - 674
    - MCCABE et al., Bio/Technology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 923 - 926
    - FINER; MCMULLEN, In Vitro Cell Dev. Biol., (19910000), vol. 27P, pages 175 - 182
    - SINGH et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19980000), vol. 96, pages 319 - 324
    - DATTA et al., Biotechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 736 - 740
    - KLEIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 4305 - 4309
    - KLEIN et al., Biotechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 559 - 563
    - KLEIN et al., Plant Physiol., (19880000), vol. 91, pages 440 - 444
    - FROMM et al., Biotechnology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839
    - HOOYKAAS-VAN SLOGTEREN et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 311, pages 763 - 764
    - BYTEBIER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 5345 - 5349
    - DE WET et al., The Experimental Manipulation of Ovule Tissues, Longman, (19850000), pages 197 - 209
    - KAEPPLER et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19900000), vol. 9, pages 415 - 418
    - KAEPPLER et al., Theor. Appl. Genet., (19920000), vol. 84, pages 560 - 566
    - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505
    - LI et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 250 - 255
    - CHRISTOU; FORD, Annals of Botany, (19950000), vol. 75, pages 407 - 413
    - OSJODA et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750
    - MCCORMICK et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19860000), vol. 5, pages 81 - 84
    - PIATEK et al., Plant Biotechnol J, (20150000), vol. 13, pages 578 - 589
    - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Biotechnol J, (20130000), vol. 11, pages 933 - 941
    - FENG et al., Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 1229 - 1232
    - PODEVIN et al., Trends Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 375 - 383
    - WEI et al., J Gen Genomics, (20130000), vol. 40, pages 281 - 289
    - ZETSCHE et al., Cell, (20150000), vol. 163, pages 759 - 771
    - DALE et al., Plant J, (19950000), vol. 7, pages 649 - 659
    - LYZNIK et al., Transgenic Plant J, (20070000), vol. 1, pages 1 - 9
    - LI et al., Plant Physiol, (20090000), vol. 151, pages 1087 - 1095
    - YAU et al., Plant J, (20110000), vol. 701, pages 147 - 166
    - WRIGHT et al., Plant J, (20050000), vol. 44, pages 693 - 705
    - CAI et al., Plant Mol Biol, (20090000), vol. 69, pages 699 - 709
    - LIEBERMAN-LAZAROVICH; LEVY, Methods Mol Biol, (20110000), vol. 701, pages 51 - 65
    - PUCHTA, Plant Mol Biol, (20020000), vol. 48, pages 173 - 182
    - CLANCY; HANNAH, Plant Physiol., (20020000), vol. 130, no. 2, pages 918 - 29
    - CHUA et al., Plant Cell, (20030000), vol. 15, pages 11468 - 1479
    - CHEN et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 13641 - 13649
    - CHUDALAYANDI, Methods Mol. Biol., (20110000), vol. 701, pages 285 - 300
    - BENFREY et al., EMBO J, (19900000), vol. 9, pages 1677 - 1684
    - HIRSCHHORN et al., Genes and Dev, (19920000), vol. 6, pages 2288 - 2298
    - NARLIKAR et al., Cell, (20020000), vol. 108, pages 475 - 487
    - HSIEH, Mol Cell Biol, (19940000), vol. 14, pages 5487 - 5494
    - MCGINNIS et al., Cell, (19830000), vol. 34, pages 75 - 84
    - HIRATSU et al., Plant J, (20030000), vol. 34, pages 733 - 739
    - ZHANG et al., Front Plant Sci, (20160000), vol. 7, page 148
 WO2015US43989