Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464488

EP3464488 - REFRACTORY COATING MATERIAL CONTAINING LOW BIOPERSISTENT FIBERS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unifrax I LLC
600 Riverwalk Parkway, Suite 120
Tonawanda, NY 14150 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GEISE, Matthew
2686 Grace Avenue
Newfane New York 14108 / US
02 / DE SOUZA, Mauricio Munhoz
48 Cree-Ton Drive
Amherst New York 14228 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Teipel, Stephan , et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17733210.323.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33960
Priority number, dateUS201662345983P06.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345983 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213839
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464488
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09D7/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FEUERFESTES BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL MIT FASERN MIT GERINGER BIOPERSISTENZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:REFRACTORY COATING MATERIAL CONTAINING LOW BIOPERSISTENT FIBERS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME[2019/15]
French:MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT RÉFRACTAIRE RENFERMANT DES FIBRES À FAIBLE BIOPERSISTANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT RÉFRACTAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
12.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010074711  (UNIFRAX I LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 3 * * abstract *;
 [X]US2013331489  (KREH ROBERT PAUL [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * abstract *;
 [X]US2013090410  (KREH ROBERT PAUL [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * abstract *
by applicantUS5874375
 US6953757
 US6030910
 US6025288
 US5585312
 US5332699
 US5714421
 US7259118
 US7153796
 US6861381
 US5955389
 US5928075
 US5821183
 US5811360