Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3464488 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3464488



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
12.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4