blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3464488 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3464488



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
11.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
11.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
12.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3