blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3464488 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780034943 EP17733210



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017349769Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016
US201715602574 23.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190015381Global Dossier 13.02.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016
WO2017US33960 23.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019522698Global Dossier 15.08.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016
WO2017US33960 23.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109642097Global Dossier 16.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016
WO2017US33960 23.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3464488Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016
WO2017US33960 23.05.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017213839Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662345983 06.06.2016