Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468981

EP3468981 - HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION CHROMATOGRAPHY FOR PURIFICATION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biogen MA Inc.
225 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GRONKE, Robert, S.
c/o Biogen MA Inc.
225 Binney Street
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
02 / JOSHI, Ratnesh, S.
c/o Biogen MA Inc.
225 Binney Street
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733243.413.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37126
Priority number, dateUS201662349970P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349970 P
US201762492402P01.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762492402 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218454
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468981
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07H1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HYDROPHOBE INTERAKTIONSCHROMATOGRAFIE ZUR REINIGUNG VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN[2019/16]
English:HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTION CHROMATOGRAPHY FOR PURIFICATION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES[2019/16]
French:CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'INTERACTION HYDROPHOBE POUR LA PURIFICATION D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6087491  (TANG JIN-YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * column 11, lines 1-15 * * column 12, lines 37-64 *;
 [XI]WO9601268  (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-24,27,29,30 * abstract * * page 7, lines 18-25 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 17 * * pages 16-19; examples 3-5 * [I] 25,26,28,31-33;
 [A]WO2004020449  (QUIATECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-33 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9847910  (NEXSTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 6, lines 22-31 *;
 [A]  - RAMAGE R ET AL, "4-(17-tetrabenzo[a,c,g,i]fluorenylmethyl)-41',4''-Dimethoxytrityl Chloride: A hydrophobic 5'-protecting group for the separation of synthetic oligonucleotides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 34, no. 44, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61618-0, ISSN 0040-4039, (19931029), pages 7133 - 7136, (19931029), XP026637308 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61618-0
by applicantUS7399845
 US2004171570
 US7427672
 WO2007002390
 WO2010148249
 US8980853
 WO2015153800
 WO2008US68922
 WO2008US64591
 WO2008US66154