Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469036

EP3469036 - LOW-PHOSPHORUS AND NON-PHOSPHORUS GELLED HYDROCARBON WELL TREATMENT FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Post Office Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Leiming
c/o Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Post Office Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
02 / AL-MUNTASHERI, Ghaithan A.
c/o Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Post Office Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
03 / LIANG, Feng
c/o Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Post Office Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
04 / OZDEN, Sehmus
c/o Saudi Arabian Oil Company
Post Office Box 5000
Dhahran 31311 / SA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733249.113.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37173
Priority number, dateUS201662349269P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349269 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218484
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469036
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09K8/03, C09K8/64, C09K8/82
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PHOSPHORARME UND PHOSPHORFREIE GELIERTE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFBOHRLOCHBEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEITEN[2019/16]
English:LOW-PHOSPHORUS AND NON-PHOSPHORUS GELLED HYDROCARBON WELL TREATMENT FLUIDS[2019/16]
French:FLUIDES DE TRAITEMENT DE PUITS D'HYDROCARBURES GÉLIFIÉS À BASSE TENEUR EN PHOSPHORE ET SANS PHOSPHORE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6248699  (SUBRAMANIAN SHANKAR [US], et al) [X] 1-8,13-18,20-23,28,29 * example 1; claims 1,15; table 1 * [I] 9-12,19,24-27;
 [A]US3799267  (ELY J, et al) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 37; example I; claim 1 *;
 [A]CA2665442  (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA]) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0065] - [0071]; claims 1,2,7,12,14-16 *