EP3473048 - RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURES IN NEXT GENERATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | ||
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Convida Wireless, LLC 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Joseph, M. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 02 /
ADJAKPLE, Pascal, M. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wei 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 04 /
IYER, Lakshmi, R. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Qian 15 Compton Court Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 06 /
TSAI, Allan Y 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Guodong 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | 08 /
LI, Qing 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | [2019/24] |
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
MURRAY, Joseph, M. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | ||
02 /
ADJAKPLE, Pascal, M. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Wei 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | |||
04 /
IYER, Lakshmi, R. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Qian 335 Penns Way Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | |||
06 /
TSAI, Allan Y 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Guodong 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | |||
08 /
LI, Qing 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17733295.4 | 15.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US37658 | Priority number, date | US201662350379P | 15.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662350379 P | US201662400813P | 28.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662400813 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017218762 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473048 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473048 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04L5/00, H04B7/26, H04B7/08, H04B7/06 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W74/002 (CN,KR);
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/2603 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/28 (CN,KR,US);
H04W72/046 (CN,KR,US);
H04W74/008 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/043 (US);
H04L27/2607 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04L5/00, H04W16/28, H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN IN NETZWERKEN DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2019/17] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURES IN NEXT GENERATION NETWORKS | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDURES D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 14.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24157675.0 / EP4346116 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2015147717 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 18 - page 17, line 25; figure 8 *[A] 2-12; | [X]WO2016086144 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0159]; figures 13, 17 * * paragraph [0241] - paragraph [0250] * * paragraph [0264] - paragraph [0272] * * paragraph [0287] * * paragraph [0352] - paragraph [0357] *; | [XA] - SAMSUNG, "Random Access Procedure in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163372_RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051104903 [X] 1 * page 5; figures 6, 7 * [A] 2-12 | by applicant | - ERIK DAHLMAN; STEFAN PARKVALL; JOHAN SKOLD, 4G LTE/LTE-Advanced for Mobile Broadband, Academic Press |