Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3462912

EP3462912 - HIGH LOAD FLAVOR PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SNYDER, Donald
Firmenich Incorporated
250 Plainsboro Road
Plainsboro New Jersey 08536 / US
02 / ZHANG, Jian
Firmenich Incorporated
250 Plainsboro Road
Plainsboro New Jersey 08536 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dureisseix, Valérie
Firmenich SA
P.O. Box 239
Route des Jeunes 1
1211 Genève 8 / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17733357.224.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62690
Priority number, dateUS201662342617P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342617 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203006
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3462912
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A23L27/00, A23L29/219, A23L29/30, A23P30/20, A23P10/30
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:GESCHMACKSPARTIKEL MIT HOHER LADUNG[2019/15]
English:HIGH LOAD FLAVOR PARTICLES[2019/15]
French:PARTICULES D'ARÔME À CHARGE ÉLEVÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2014128071  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 6 * * page 3, line 1 - page 10, line 12 * * example -; claim - * [I] 6-8;
 [XI]US2016058047  (ZASYPKIN DMITRIY [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0031] - [0094] * * example -; claim - * [I] 3,4,6-8;
 [XI]WO0025606  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]; MUTKA JERRY RICHARD [US]; MCIVER ROBERT CLARK [U) [X] 5 * page 1, lines 5-22 * * page 4, line 1 - page 21, line 3 * * example -; claim - * [I] 1-4,6-8;
 [XI]WO8503414  (SCM CORP [US]) [X] 5 * page 1, lines 3-18 * * page 5, line 1 - page 11, line 10 * * example -; claim - * [I] 1-4,6-8;
 [XI]US2009047434  (TROPHARDY GIL [FR]) [X] 5,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0073] * * example -; claim - * [I] 1-4,6,8
by applicantUS7488503
 US2013243851
    - H. SCHERZ, Hydrokolloide : Stabilisatoren, Dickungs- und Geliermittel in Lebensmittel, Behr's VerlagGmbH & Co, (19960000), vol. 2