Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468786

EP3468786 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM WP Patent Holding A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Lars
Maskedal 9
8860 Skanderborg / DK
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)COPA Copenhagen Patents
Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor
1970 Frederiksberg C / DK
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733384.613.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64402
Priority number, dateEP2016017436114.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174361
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216155
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468786
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29D99/00, B29C70/44, B29C70/54, B29C65/70
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Validation statesMA11.01.2019
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL[2019/16]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2015114098  (LM WP PATENT HOLDING AS [DK]) [YD] 1-15 * figure 5 * * page 11, lines 5-8, 14-15 * * page 12, lines 12-23, 28-32 * * page 20, lines 4-6 *;
 [Y]EP2620265  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] *
by applicantUS2012009070
 WO2015114098
 EP2620265