Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472552

EP3472552 - EFFICIENT SAMPLING OF OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY DATA FOR EXPLICIT RANGING OVER EXTENDED DEPTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Meditec AG
Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52
07745 Jena / DE
For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Meditec, Inc.
5160 Hacienda Drive
Dublin, CA 94568 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Yuan
5200 Iron Horse Parkway
Apt. 513
Dublin, CA 94568 / US
02 / SHEMONSKI, Nathan
1700 De Anza Blvd., Apt. 209
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
03 / EVERETT, Matthew J.
2566 Regent Road
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
 [2019/19]
Former [2019/17]01 / LIU, Yuan
5200 Iron Horse Parkway
Apt. 513
Dublin, CA 94568 / US
02 / SHEMONSKI, Nathan
1684 Washington Street
Apt. 3
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
03 / EVERETT, Matthew J.
2566 Regent Road
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
Representative(s)Beck, Bernard
Carl Zeiss AG
Patentabteilung
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17733387.914.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64580
Priority number, dateUS201662350603P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350603 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216242
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472552
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01B9/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTE ABTASTUNG VON OPTISCHEN KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAFISCHEN DATEN ZUR EXPLIZITEN ENTFERNUNGSMESSUNG ÜBER ERWEITERTE TIEFE[2019/17]
English:EFFICIENT SAMPLING OF OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY DATA FOR EXPLICIT RANGING OVER EXTENDED DEPTH[2019/17]
French:ÉCHANTILLONNAGE EFFICACE DE DONNÉES DE TOMOGRAPHIE À COHÉRENCE OPTIQUE POUR UNE TÉLÉMÉTRIE EXPLICITE SUR UNE PROFONDEUR ÉTENDUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2018National basic fee paid 
04.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
04.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2007076220  (KAWAHARA KARIN [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] - [0020] - [0025] , [0031] , [0036] , [0069] , [0070] *;
 [A]EP1770352  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - MEENA SIDDIQUI ET AL, "Optical-domain subsampling for data efficient depth ranging in Fourier-domain optical coherence tomography", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120730), vol. 20, no. 16, doi:10.1364/OE.20.017938, ISSN 1094-4087, page 17938, XP055135899 [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.017938
by applicantUS7990541
 US9163930
 EP1870028
 US8937724
 US7929146
 US7019838
 US9279659
 US9441948
 US7330270
 US8757803