Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464207

EP3464207 - PROCESS FOR FORMING A BARRIER COATING AT THE SURFACE OF A CONTAINER AND RELATED FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SGD S.A.
14 bis terrasse Bellini
92800 Puteaux / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ETCHEPARE, Pierre-Luc
5 rue de la Reine Mathilde
76260 Eu / FR
02 / ZHANG, Jingwei
38 rue des Ruelles
91300 Massy / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Weber, Jean-François
Cabinet Didier Martin
Les Terrasses des Bruyères -Bâtiment C
314 C Allée des Noisetiers
69760 Limonest / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Weber, Jean-François
Cabinet Didier Martin 50 Chemin des Verrières
69260 Charbonnieres Les Bains / FR
Application number, filing date17733498.401.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51378
Priority number, dateFR2016005503902.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655039
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207940
Date:07.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464207
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/00, C03C17/22, C03C17/23, C03C23/00, C23C16/02, C23C16/44
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINER SPERRBESCHICHTUNG AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES BEHÄLTERS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE ANLAGE[2019/15]
English:PROCESS FOR FORMING A BARRIER COATING AT THE SURFACE OF A CONTAINER AND RELATED FACILITY[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT BARRIÈRE A LA SURFACE D'UN RÉCIPIENT ET INSTALLATION AFFÉRENTE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO8911920  (OLIN CORP) [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * examples 3, 4 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23;
 [IY]GB2061243  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * example 1 * [Y] 1-6,9,12,14,18,19,23;
 [IY]  - GULINO A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OFNOVEL SELF-GENERATING LIQUID MOCVDPRECURSORS FOR THIN FILMS OF ZINC OXIDE", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20000201), vol. 12, no. 2, doi:10.1021/CM991154K, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 548 - 554, XP000927811 [I] 10,11,15,16,21 * quatrième paragraphe; page 550 * * table 2 * [Y] 1-4,7,9,12-14,18,20,22,23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm991154k
 [IY]  - UEYAMA R ET AL, "PREPARATION OF IRON OXIDE THIN FILMS BY MOCVD", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19961001), vol. 104, no. 10, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 946 - 950, XP000686245 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2. Experimental Method * * table 1 * [Y] 1-4,7,9,12-14,18,20,22,23
 [IY]  - MASANOBU AIZAWA ET AL, "PREPARATION OF ZRO2-Y2O3 FILMS BY CVD USING B-DIKETONE METAL CHELATES", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19930301), vol. 101, no. 3, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 283 - 286, XP000381420 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2. Experiment; page 283 * * figure 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23
 [IY]  - ITOH H ET AL, "PREPARATION OF ZRO2-MGO THIN FILMS BY OMCVD", JOURNAL OF THE CERAMIC SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, FUJI TECHNOLOGY PRESS, TOKYO, JP, (19891001), vol. 97, no. 10, ISSN 0912-9200, pages 1065 - 1070, XP000114023 [I] 8,10,11,15,16,21 * 2-2. Experimental Apparatus; page 1065 * * 3-1. Forming Conditions of ZrO2 Film; page 1066; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,12,14,18,20,23
 [IY]  - WALTHER M ET AL, "PACKAGING OF SENSITIVE PARENTERAL DRUGS IN GLASS CONTAINERS WITH A QUARTZ-LIKE SURFACE", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY EUROPE - BIOPHARM, ADVANSTAR COMMUNICATIONS, CHESTER, GB, (19960101), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 22,24 - 27, XP000827860 [I] 17 * page 24 - paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-7,9,12-14,18-20,22,23