Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468486

EP3468486 - IMPLANTABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Cape Town
Lovers Walk Rondebosch
Cape Town 7700 / ZA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HENDRICKS, Mogamat Rushdie
8 Bruce Road
Constantia
7806 Cape Town / ZA
02 / BEZUIDENHOUT, Deon
4 Windsor Bellair Road
Vredehoek
8001 Cape Town / ZA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17733533.809.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53421
Priority number, dateGB2016001017710.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610177
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212449
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468486
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/06, A61B17/00, A61B17/24
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARE VORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:IMPLANTABLE DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF IMPLANTABLE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2009007922  (HARRINGTON DOUGLAS C [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4a-6 * [A] 9-15;
 [XI]US2002058959  (GELLMAN BARRY N [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0056]; figure 8 * [I] 9,14;
 [X]US2007142698  (BOURNE GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *;
 [XA]CA2847581  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 11; figure 2A * [A] 9-15;
 [X]US2002183858  (CONTILIANO JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP1506790  (DEPUY MITEK INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0039]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0096] *;
 [A]US2011021868  (BROWNING JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072]; figure 8 *;
 [A]EP2381904  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figure 11A *