Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469660

EP3469660 - CONNECTOR WITH ASYMMETRIC BASE SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Graham Harry, Jr.
2407 Rolling Hills Drive
Mechanicsburg, Pennsylvania 17055 / US
02 / WALTON, Scott Eric
2202 Risser Mill Road
Mount Joy, Pennsylvania 17552 / US
03 / TSANG, Albert
7101 Pine Ridge Drive
Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17111 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733538.709.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53437
Priority number, dateUS201662348651P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348651 P
US20171561771108.06.2017         Original published format: US201715617711
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212457
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469660
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/41
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERBINDER MIT ASYMMETRISCHEM BASISABSCHNITT[2019/16]
English:CONNECTOR WITH ASYMMETRIC BASE SECTION[2019/16]
French:CONNECTEUR AVEC SECTION DE BASE ASYMÉTRIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US3223960  (RUEHLEMANN HERBERT E) [X] 1,5,9 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 23; figures 1,5 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10-12;
 [XI]EP0806814  (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 1,5,9 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,4,5 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10-12;
 [A]US2004180562  (RAISTRICK ALAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034]; figures 6,7 *