Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466051

EP3466051 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL NOISE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GoPro, Inc.
3000 Clearview Way, Building E
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DOUADY, Bruno César
c/o GoPro, Inc.
3000 Clearview Way
Bldg. E
San Mateo California 94402 / US
02 / KRAAK, Michael Serge Andre
c/o GoPro, Inc.
3000 Clearview Way
Bldg. E
San Mateo California 94402 / US
03 / GUERIN, Guillaume Matthieu
c/o GoPro, Inc.
3000 Clearview Way
Bldg. E
San Mateo California 94402 / US
04 / VEIT, Thomas Nicolas Emmanuel
c/o GoPro, Inc.
3000 Clearview Way
Bldg. E
San Mateo California 94402 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17733645.024.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34231
Priority number, dateUS201662341580P25.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341580 P
US201662341415P25.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341415 P
US20161526803816.09.2016         Original published format: US201615268038
US20161535849522.11.2016         Original published format: US201615358495
US20171539926905.01.2017         Original published format: US201715399269
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205492
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466051
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/357
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALE RAUSCHMINDERUNG[2019/15]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL NOISE REDUCTION[2019/15]
French:RÉDUCTION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DU BRUIT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2016037061  (LIM SUK HWAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 4-11 [I] 14,15;
 [XAI]WO2015172235  (TANDEMLAUNCH TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0162]; figures 3,4 * [A] 4-11 [I] 14,15;
 [XAI]US2013051697  (TAKAHASHI NAOTO [JP]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,11 [I] 14,15;
 [A]US2011033130  (POON EUNICE [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0097]; figures 2, 4, 7 *