Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472340

EP3472340 - PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITED BIOSENSOR COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Chemical Company
200 South Wilcox Drive
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HOCHSTETLER, Spencer Erich
1721 Rock Springs Road
Kingsport TN 37664 / US
02 / ASHFORD, Dennis Lee II
234 Laurel Canyon
Johnson City TN 37615 / US
03 / SAMBANDAM, Senthil Nathan
4983 Collins Chase Place
Fairfax VA 22030 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ricker, Mathias
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17733658.301.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35353
Priority number, dateUS201662350476P15.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350476 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218197
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472340
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/00, G01N27/327, G01N33/543, G01N33/553, C23C14/22
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUFGEDAMPFTE BIOSENSORKOMPONENTEN[2019/17]
English:PHYSICAL VAPOR DEPOSITED BIOSENSOR COMPONENTS[2019/17]
French:COMPOSANTS DE BIOCAPTEURS DÉPOSÉS PHYSIQUEMENT EN PHASE VAPEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2018National basic fee paid 
23.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
23.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2016100266  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [XP] 1-20 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO2010123802  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 33; figure 1; claim - *;
 [Y]US2006175199  (HUANG CHUN-MU [TW]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0010] , [0068]; claim - *;
 [E]WO2017112688  (MATERION CORP [US]) [E] 1-20 * claim - *
 [Y]  - JUAN M. MARIOLI ET AL, "Electrochemical detection of carbohydrates at nickel-copper and nickel-chromium-iron alloy electrodes", ELECTROANALYSIS., US, (19930101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1002/elan.1140050104, ISSN 1040-0397, pages 11 - 15, XP055394732 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 12, column l., paragraph bottom; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elan.1140050104