Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472541

EP3472541 - MECHANICAL SUBCOOLER WITH BATTERY SUPPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
17900 Beeline Highway
Jupiter, FL 33478 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / POOLMAN, Ciara
6304 Thompson Road
Syracuse, New York 13057 / US
02 / CHOPKO, Robert A.
P.O. Box 4805
Carrier Parkway
TR20
Syracuse, New York 13221 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17733701.116.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37901
Priority number, dateUS201662351729P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351729 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218909
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472541
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00, F25B40/02, F25B7/00, F25D11/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHER UNTERKÜHLER MIT BATTERIEVERSORGUNG[2019/17]
English:MECHANICAL SUBCOOLER WITH BATTERY SUPPLEMENT[2019/17]
French:SOUS-REFROIDISSEUR MÉCANIQUE AVEC BATTERIE D'APPOINT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2014082069  (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [Y] 1-27 * abstract * * page 10, line 26 - page 12, line 18; figure 4 * * page 12, line 25 - page 14, line 9; figure 5 *;
 [Y]WO2015174830  (UNIT45 B V [NL]; YANGZHOU TONGLEE REEFER CONTAINER CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-27 * page 9, lines 16-25; figure 1 * * abstract * * page 12, line 26 - page 13, line 4; figure 3 *;
 [YD]US6223546  (CHOPKO ROBERT A [US] ET AL) [YD] 3,12,21 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS6223546