Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472543

EP3472543 - BATTERY FOR TEMPORARY COOLING OF A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
17900 Beeline Highway
Jupiter, FL 33478 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / POOLMAN, Ciara
6304 Thompson Road
Syracuse, New York 13057 / US
02 / MOSELEY, Garrison, S.
6304 Thompson Road
Syracuse, New York 13221 / US
03 / CHOPKO, Robert A.
P. O. Box 4805
Carrier Parkway
TR20
Syracuse, New York 13221 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17733703.716.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37904
Priority number, dateUS201662351707P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351707 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218912
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472543
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00, B60H1/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:BATTERIE ZUR TEMPORÄREN KÜHLUNG EINER TRANSPORTKÄLTEANLAGE[2019/17]
English:BATTERY FOR TEMPORARY COOLING OF A TRANSPORT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:BATTERIE POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT TEMPORAIRE D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION DE TRANSPORT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011301762  (WALKER TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0022] , [0023] , [0034] , [0035]; figures 1,2,3 *;
 [Y]US2015338858  (BATES SCOTT ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0019] - [0021] - [0 23] , [0029] - [0035] - [0 40] - [0043]; figures 1,2,3,4 *;
 [Y]US2003106332  (OKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4,7,9-11,14,16,17,21 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figures 1, 10 *
by applicantUS6223546