Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471643

EP3471643 - ELECTROSURGICAL RETURN ELECTRODE AND RFID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Megadyne Medical Products, Inc.
11506 South State Street
Draper, UT 84020 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / EHNINGER, Michael D.
11506 South State Street
Draper, Utah 84020 / US
02 / BORGMEIER, Paul R.
11506 South State Street
Draper, Utah 84020 / US
03 / GREEP, Darcy W.
11506 South State Street
Draper, Utah 84020 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bettridge, Paul Sebastian
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17733712.819.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US38093
Priority number, dateUS201662351813P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351813 P
US20171559927618.05.2017         Original published format: US201715599276
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219015
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471643
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/16, H01Q7/00, H01Q21/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE NEUTRALELEKTRODE UND RFID-SYSTEM[2019/17]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL RETURN ELECTRODE AND RFID SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:ÉLECTRODE DE RETOUR ÉLECTROCHIRURGICALE ET SYSTÈME RFID[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2015100438  (MEGADYNE MED PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-11,14,17,18 * abstract * * pages 9-42 * [Y] 16,25-33 [I] 24;
 [XD]US2015182280  (EHNINGER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [XD] 1-11,14,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0149] *;
 [X]CA1219642  (FRIZE MONIQUE, et al) [X] 1,12,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5114424  (HAGEN UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 16,25,26 * abstract * * columns 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2008237341  (FLECK STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 28-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0110] - [0115] *;
 [Y]EP2747199  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] *;
 [A]US2013016021  (BLAIR WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0083] *
by applicantUS9136597
 US8264342
 US2015182280